NY A03320 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - held for consideration in housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - held for consideration in housing
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for preferences under the affordable home ownership development program for service related disabled veterans.
Title
Provides for preferences under the affordable home ownership development program for service related disabled veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in housing |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03969 (Same As) 2016-02-09 - referred to housing