NY A03301 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - approval memo.24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-2)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - approval memo.24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the 15 member New York Asian American and Pacific Islander commission to develop policies to improve the community, economic and social well-being, and the health and educational needs important to Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state; to develop and coordinate statewide programs, recognizing the continuing contributions of Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals in the state; to create and implement public education campaigns regarding Asian American and Pacific Islander issues and culture; to increase the awareness among Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals of state and local resources that may benefit Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals and communities as a whole; and to undertake any other activities the commission deems necessary and applicable to support Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state.
Title
Establishes the 15 member New York Asian American and Pacific Islander commission to develop policies to improve the community, economic and social well-being, and the health and educational needs important to Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state; to develop and coordinate statewide programs, recognizing the continuing contributions of Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals in the state; to create and implement public education campaigns regarding Asian American and Pacific Islander issues and culture; to increase the awareness among Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals of state and local resources that may benefit Asian American and Pacific Islander individuals and communities as a whole; and to undertake any other activities the commission deems necessary and applicable to support Asian American and Pacific Islander communities in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-17 | Assembly | approval memo.24 |
2023-11-17 | Assembly | signed chap.639 |
2023-11-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1073 |
2023-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1051A |
2023-06-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3301a |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.338 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.338 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S01051 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3301A