NY A03270 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-23 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-23 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This legislation would create the Empire State Fishing Trail program in order to recognize the importance of New York's growing reputation as a top bass fishing destination and its economic impact on tourism in the state.
Title
An act to amend the economic development law, in relation to creating the Empire State Fishing Trail program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-23 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2010-02-23 | delivered to senate | |
2010-02-23 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-06 | ordered to third reading cal.256 | |
2010-01-06 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-01-06 | DIED IN SENATE | |
2009-06-15 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-16 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-11 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-10 | ordered to third reading rules cal.187 | |
2009-06-10 | rules report cal.187 | |
2009-06-10 | reported | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-10 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-05-21 | reference changed to tourism, arts and sports development | |
2009-01-23 | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S283 (Same As) 2010-03-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE