NY A03190 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health to establish means of educating proprietors and employees of public eating establishments about food allergens.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health to establish means of educating proprietors and employees of public eating establishments about food allergens.
Sponsors
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-02-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02858 (Same As) 2018-05-31 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE