NY A03119 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a constitutional amendment directing the legislature to establish a procedure for the creation of Peconic county; provides that Peconic county shall consist of the towns of East Hampton, Riverhead, Shelter Island, Southampton and Southold in the county of Suffolk.
Title
Provides for a constitutional amendment directing the legislature to establish a procedure for the creation of Peconic county; provides that Peconic county shall consist of the towns of East Hampton, Riverhead, Shelter Island, Southampton and Southold in the county of Suffolk.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2014-01-10 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2013-02-20 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2013-01-28 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2013-01-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S02449 (Same As) 2014-02-19 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY