NY A03103 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a system of merit selection of judges of the state's major trial courts instead of elections and for the designation of certain justices of the supreme court; affects certain courts including the supreme court, surrogate's court, the New York city civil court, the New York city criminal court and the district court.
Title
Establishes a system of merit selection of judges of the state's major trial courts instead of elections and for the designation of certain justices of the supreme court; affects certain courts including the supreme court, surrogate's court, the New York city civil court, the New York city criminal court and the district court.
Sponsors
Asm. Robert Carroll [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D] |
Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-02-13 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2019-01-30 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |