NY A03049 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to providing access to services, law enforcement and counsel in certain immigration related matters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing access to services, law enforcement and counsel in certain immigration related matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-06SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2017-02-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-02-06Assemblypassed assembly
2017-02-06Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.17
2017-02-06Assemblyrules report cal.17
2017-02-06Assemblyreported
2017-02-06Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-02-03Assemblyprint number 3049b
2017-02-03Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2017-02-03Assemblyprint number 3049a
2017-02-03Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2017-01-30Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-25Assemblyreferred to codes

Same As/Similar To

S04075 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03049&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03049&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03049
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03049&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03049A
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03049&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A03049B
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03049&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03049&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03049&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A03049&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback