NY A02930 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - signed chap.128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-15 - signed chap.128
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the village board of trustees of the incorporated village of Haverstraw, Rockland county, may by resolution, provide that the office of assessor of such village may be held by a person who is not a resident of such village, provided that such person resides in Rockland, Westchester, Orange or Putnam county.
Title
Provides that the village board of trustees of the incorporated village of Haverstraw, Rockland county, may by resolution, provide that the office of assessor of such village may be held by a person who is not a resident of such village, provided that such person resides in Rockland, Westchester, Orange or Putnam county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-15 | Senate | signed chap.128 |
2011-07-08 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1294 |
2011-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5638 |
2011-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.451 |
2011-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2011-04-08 | Assembly | print number 2930a |
2011-04-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2011-01-21 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05638 (Same As) 2011-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2930A