NY A02892 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that prepaid cellular telephone cards have the expiration date of the minutes purchased printed on the card in conspicuous print.
Title
Requires that prepaid cellular telephone cards have the expiration date of the minutes purchased printed on the card in conspicuous print.
Sponsors
Asm. Erik Dilan [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2018-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.2032 |
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2356A |
2018-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.235 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.134 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.134 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | print number 2892a |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S02356 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2892A