NY A02890 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - substituted by s823
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-13 - substituted by s823
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that applications submitted by individuals with developmental disabilities for eligibility determinations and service authorizations be processed in a timely manner; provides that where such application is not reasonably clear or omits required information or where the office reasonably suspects fraud based on specific information available, the office shall notify the applicant in writing requesting the specific information needed to process such application; removes reporting requirements.
Title
Requires that applications submitted by individuals with developmental disabilities for eligibility determinations and service authorizations be processed in a timely manner; provides that where such application is not reasonably clear or omits required information or where the office reasonably suspects fraud based on specific information available, the office shall notify the applicant in writing requesting the specific information needed to process such application; removes reporting requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Assembly | substituted by s823 |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.48 |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-31 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S00823 (Same As) 2023-03-24 - SIGNED CHAP.106