NY A02869 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - amended on third reading 2869a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-09 - amended on third reading 2869a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to provision of patient health information and medical records; expands the definition of medical records to include all health related records; prohibits fees for providing certain records.
Title
Relates to provision of patient health information and medical records; expands the definition of medical records to include all health related records; prohibits fees for providing certain records.
Sponsors
Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D] |
Asm. David McDonough [R] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-09 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2869a |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.233 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2017-03-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.104 |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03445 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH