NY A02866 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the superintendent of financial services shall establish standards for hurricane windstorm deductibles, creating uniformity in the operation of such deductibles with respect to the triggering event.
Title
Provides that the superintendent of financial services shall establish standards for hurricane windstorm deductibles, creating uniformity in the operation of such deductibles with respect to the triggering event.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1833 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4199 |
2024-03-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.81 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-05-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.160 |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S04199 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2866