NY A02767 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repeals subdivision 3 of section 117 of the social services law relating to public assistance benefits to or for new residents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals subdivision 3 of section 117 of the social services law relating to public assistance benefits to or for new residents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-17Assemblyheld for consideration in ways and means
2014-02-26Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-01-08Assemblyreferred to social services
2013-03-13Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2013-01-17Assemblyreferred to social services

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback