NY A02744 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - advanced to third reading cal.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-22 - advanced to third reading cal.418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits cancellation, non-renewal or conditioning renewal of automobile insurance of a policyholder solely as a result of a dispute or a complaint pending against the insurer.
Title
Prohibits cancellation, non-renewal or conditioning renewal of automobile insurance of a policyholder solely as a result of a dispute or a complaint pending against the insurer.
Sponsors
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Guillermo Linares [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] |
Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Peter Rivera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.418 |
2012-03-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-03-06 | Assembly | print number 2744a |
2012-03-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2011-03-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.146 |
2011-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-20 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S07603 (Same As) 2012-06-06 - REFERRED TO INSURANCE