NY A02693 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - signed chap.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to signatures for any party position of member of the ward, town, city or county committee; not less than three per centum of the then enrolled voters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to signatures for any party position of member of the ward, town, city or county committee; not less than three per centum of the then enrolled voters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20Senatesigned chap.18
2019-02-19Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-02-12SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-02-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-02-12Senate3RD READING CAL.101
2019-02-12SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2699
2019-01-28SenateREFERRED TO ELECTIONS
2019-01-28Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-01-28Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-28Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.26
2019-01-28Assemblyrules report cal.26
2019-01-28Assemblyreported
2019-01-28Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-01-25Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S02699 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2693

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02693&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02693&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A02693
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02693&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02693&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02693&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/A2693#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback