NY A02611 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for clarification of the disposition of human remains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for clarification of the disposition of human remains.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH
2018-03-12Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-03-12Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.208
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-05-24SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2017-05-24Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-05-24Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-18Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.393
2017-05-16Assemblyreported
2017-05-09Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-01-20Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S00171 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO HEALTH

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback