NY A02593 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - advanced to third reading cal.674
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - advanced to third reading cal.674
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires applicants for all-night liquor licenses to notify local community boards of their intent to apply for such licenses.
Title
Requires applicants for all-night liquor licenses to notify local community boards of their intent to apply for such licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.674 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2013-01-16 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06898 (Same As) 2014-06-23 - referred to economic development