NY A02574 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed chap.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to fix by regulation measures for the management of crabs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends the authority of the department of environmental conservation to fix by regulation measures for the management of crabs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Senatesigned chap.20
2019-03-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2019-03-04SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-03-04SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-03-04Senate3RD READING CAL.78
2019-03-04SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S2409
2019-02-11SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-02-11Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-02-11Assemblypassed assembly
2019-01-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.30
2019-01-29Assemblyreported
2019-01-23Assemblyreferred to environmental conservation

Same As/Similar To

S02409 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2574

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback