NY A02567 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health care professionals to prescribe opioid antagonists when prescribing an opioid and discuss the dangers of opioid addiction with such patient in a manner consistent with regulations promulgated by the commissioner of health.
Title
Requires health care professionals to prescribe opioid antagonists when prescribing an opioid and discuss the dangers of opioid addiction with such patient in a manner consistent with regulations promulgated by the commissioner of health.
Sponsors
Asm. Charles Fall [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Gary Pretlow [D] |
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to health |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01546 (Same As) 2021-01-13 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
S08106 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE
S08106 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE