NY A02566 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.690
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - signed chap.690
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands eligibility for those who receive awards under crime victims' compensation to include a domestic partner; defines domestic partner; further provides for out-of-pocket loss to include the cost of counseling for surviving family members of homicide victims.
Title
Expands eligibility for those who receive awards under crime victims' compensation to include a domestic partner; defines domestic partner; further provides for out-of-pocket loss to include the cost of counseling for surviving family members of homicide victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 122 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Senate | signed chap.690 |
2019-12-17 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-05-14 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-14 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.681 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4958 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.56 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.56 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04958 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - signed chap.690