NY A02565 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-18 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain persons living with HIV or AIDS shall not be required to pay more than 30% of the household income towards shelter cost.
Title
An act to amend the social services law, in relation to limiting the percentage of income payable towards shelter costs by persons with HIV or AIDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 54 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 84 N: 54 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-18 | tabled | |
2010-09-18 | vetoed memo.6818 | |
2010-09-07 | delivered to governor | |
2010-04-27 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-04-27 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-02-22 | 3RD READING CAL.78 | |
2010-02-22 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2664 | |
2010-01-12 | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES | |
2010-01-12 | delivered to senate | |
2010-01-12 | passed assembly | |
2010-01-12 | ordered to third reading rules cal.1 | |
2010-01-12 | rules report cal.1 | |
2010-01-12 | reported | |
2010-01-12 | reported referred to rules | |
2010-01-12 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-01-06 | referred to social services | |
2009-04-21 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-01-20 | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S2664 (Same As) 2010-02-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A2565