NY A02547 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-05 - ordered to third reading cal.110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that for settlements that require a court order, the order, or the judgment in a special proceeding, shall provide for the payment of interest on the settlement amount at the statutory interest rate on judgments.
Title
Provides that for settlements that require a court order, the order, or the judgment in a special proceeding, shall provide for the payment of interest on the settlement amount at the statutory interest rate on judgments.
Sponsors
Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Harry Bronson [D] |
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] | Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] | Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.110 |
2021-03-11 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.169 |
2021-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-01-19 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00469 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY