NY A02500 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 80-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the use of segregated confinement and creates alternative therapeutic and rehabilitative confinement options; limits the length of time a person may be in segregated confinement and excludes certain persons from being placed in segregated confinement.
Title
Restricts the use of segregated confinement and creates alternative therapeutic and rehabilitative confinement options; limits the length of time a person may be in segregated confinement and excludes certain persons from being placed in segregated confinement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-23 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01623 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION