NY A02485 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.199
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.199
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes restrictions on consumer and employment contracts.
Title
Establishes restrictions on consumer and employment contracts.
Sponsors
Asm. Aravella Simotas [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] |
Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.199 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | amended on third reading 2485a |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.190 |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08456 (Same As) 2018-05-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY