NY A02485 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any bill which provides revenue to the state in a non-recurring manner shall pass by a two-thirds majority in order to become law.
Title
Requires that any bill which provides revenue to the state in a non-recurring manner shall pass by a two-thirds majority in order to become law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2016-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-02-09 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-01-22 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |