NY A02485 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-11 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the order of succession to the office of lieutenant governor.
Title
Relates to the order of succession to the office of lieutenant governor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2011-04-27 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2011-01-20 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2011-01-19 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |