NY A02456 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - signed chap.387
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the inclusion of a check off box on personal income tax return forms for the purpose of making a gift to the William B. Hoyt Memorial Children and Family trust fund for child abuse prevention.
Title
Provides for the inclusion of a check off box on personal income tax return forms for the purpose of making a gift to the William B. Hoyt Memorial Children and Family trust fund for child abuse prevention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | signed chap.387 |
2019-10-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1756 |
2019-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2503 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.392 |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S02503 (Same As) 2019-10-23 - signed chap.387