NY A02445 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the flag to be flown at half-staff to commemorate the death of certain first responders who passed away in performance of emergency response activities in this state.
Title
Directs the flag to be flown at half-staff to commemorate the death of certain first responders who passed away in performance of emergency response activities in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-01-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02161 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES