NY A02400 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the report of programs available to survivors of domestic violence.
Title
Relates to the report of programs available to survivors of domestic violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | print number 2400a |
2013-06-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2013-01-15 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S01593 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - referred to governmental operations