NY A02368 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - substituted by s6310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - substituted by s6310
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a study on the national electric safety code line height standard for overhead utility lines and communication lines as such relate to the height of agricultural equipment and other heavy duty equipment.
Title
Requires a study on the national electric safety code line height standard for overhead utility lines and communication lines as such relate to the height of agricultural equipment and other heavy duty equipment.
Sponsors
Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D] | Asm. Marianne Buttenschon [D] |
Asm. John Lemondes [R] | Asm. Jodi Giglio [R] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Assembly | substituted by s6310 |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.70 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.332 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.332 |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-01-25 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S06310 (Same As) 2024-03-13 - returned to senate