NY A02368 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-25 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to alternative exemptions for veterans; reminds assessors that certain conflicts are included for purposes of exemptions.
Title
Relates to alternative exemptions for veterans; reminds assessors that certain conflicts are included for purposes of exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.110 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.215 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | rules report cal.215 |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | print number 2368a |
2015-05-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to veterans' affairs |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S02205 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS