NY A02345 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on December 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.54
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes lactation counseling services without a referral from a physician, registered physician assistant, registered nurse practitioner, or licensed midwife.
Title
Authorizes lactation counseling services without a referral from a physician, registered physician assistant, registered nurse practitioner, or licensed midwife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Women's Issues Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.54 |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.668 |
2019-12-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.333 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | substituted for a2345 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-03-12 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.244 |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO WOMEN'S ISSUES |
2019-02-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | substituted by s3387 |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.333 |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S03387 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - APPROVAL MEMO.54