NY A02321 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-27 - print number 2321a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-27 - print number 2321a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to increased participation in state contracts and subcontracts by certified minority and women owned business enterprises; relates to certain performance and payment bond requirements.
Title
Relates to increased participation in state contracts and subcontracts by certified minority and women owned business enterprises; relates to certain performance and payment bond requirements.
Sponsors
Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] |
Asm. Vivian Cook [D] | Asm. Richard Gottfried [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Assembly | print number 2321a |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S04473 (Same As) 2022-05-26 - PRINT NUMBER 4473A