NY A02313 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s4499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-21 - substituted by s4499
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services, in consultation with the education department, to establish a course of instruction on adolescent problem gambling which may be provided in grades 4 through 12; requires the commissioner to provide such curriculum be posted on the department of education internet website.
Title
Requires the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services, in consultation with the education department, to establish a course of instruction on adolescent problem gambling which may be provided in grades 4 through 12; requires the commissioner to provide such curriculum be posted on the department of education internet website.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | Assembly | substituted by s4499 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.689 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.689 |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-03-12 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-01-14 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S04499 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - APPROVAL MEMO.14