NY A02088 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the correctional association to inspect residential juvenile detention facilities.
Title
Authorizes the correctional association to inspect residential juvenile detention facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-14 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S08611 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - PRINT NUMBER 8611A