NY A02088 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-20 - held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York state thruway authority accountability act; names the commissioner of DOT as chair of the thruway authority board; directs the commissioner of DOT to submit a plan to merge the thruway authority into the department of transportation.
Title
Enacts the New York state thruway authority accountability act; names the commissioner of DOT as chair of the thruway authority board; directs the commissioner of DOT to submit a plan to merge the thruway authority into the department of transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | Assembly | held for consideration in corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | print number 2088a |
2014-02-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S00763 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 763A