NY A02083 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - print number 2083a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - print number 2083a
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires state and local agencies to establish a priority processing procedure for the review of construction permits which meet certain energy and environmental design standards; defines terms; requires the implementation of such priority processing procedures on or before January 1, 2013.
Title
Requires state and local agencies to establish a priority processing procedure for the review of construction permits which meet certain energy and environmental design standards; defines terms; requires the implementation of such priority processing procedures on or before January 1, 2013.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | Assembly | print number 2083a |
2012-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-01-13 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S01860 (Same As) 2012-01-30 - PRINT NUMBER 1860A