NY A02071 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to legislative approval of all policies adopted by the board of regents that would have a cumulative impact of over one million dollars statewide.
Title
Relates to legislative approval of all policies adopted by the board of regents that would have a cumulative impact of over one million dollars statewide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | motion to discharge lost |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to education |