NY A02070 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes counties to employ computer generated registration lists; updates the list of supplies to be delivered to poll sites.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes counties to employ computer generated registration lists; updates the list of supplies to be delivered to poll sites.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09Assemblyenacting clause stricken
2019-02-05Assemblyprint number 2070a
2019-02-05Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-22Assemblyreferred to election law

Same As/Similar To

S00508 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback