NY A02068 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of "prevailing party" for purposes of counsel fees and expenses in certain actions against the state, to include a party whose pursuit of a non-frivolous claim or defense was a catalyst for a voluntary or unilateral change in position by the opposing party that provides any significant part of the relief sought.
Title
Expands the definition of "prevailing party" for purposes of counsel fees and expenses in certain actions against the state, to include a party whose pursuit of a non-frivolous claim or defense was a catalyst for a voluntary or unilateral change in position by the opposing party that provides any significant part of the relief sought.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.114 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.383 |
2013-05-21 | Assembly | reported |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | print number 2068a |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S00713 (Same As) 2014-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 713A