NY A02049 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - RECOMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-06 - RECOMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits discrimination against religious attire and appurtenances thereto, including facial hair.
Title
Prohibits discrimination against religious attire and appurtenances thereto, including facial hair.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-06-06 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | amended on third reading (t) 2049a |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2016-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-04-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.97 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-05-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-04-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.233 |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | reported |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-15 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S03263 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
S06867 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
S06867 (Same As) 2016-06-02 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE