NY A02047 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-11)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-09 - reported referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Limits robocalls to state residents and requires telephone service providers to offer free call blocking technology to telephone customers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limits robocalls to state residents and requires telephone service providers to offer free call blocking technology to telephone customers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-09Assemblyreported referred to codes
2021-02-03Assemblyprint number 2047a
2021-02-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions
2021-01-14Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S00068 (Same As) 2021-01-06 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback