NY A02003 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - print number 2003b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid To Localities Budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes appropriations for the support of government - Aid To Localities Budget.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11Assemblyprint number 2003b
2019-03-11Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-02-19Assemblyprint number 2003a
2019-02-19Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-18Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S01503 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - PRINT NUMBER 1503B

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback