NY A01926 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-12 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies.
Title
Relates to political contributions by limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Election Law Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.96 |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S00496 (Same As) 2017-01-04 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
S07022 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S07022 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN