NY A01921 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.146
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires inclusion and explanation of additional annual data in assessing record of performance of banking institutions in meeting community credit needs; additional data to include but not be limited to: loans for housing low and moderate-income residents of low and moderate income areas, the scope of efforts to market housing and small business loans in low and moderate-income areas and other data.
Title
Requires inclusion and explanation of additional annual data in assessing record of performance of banking institutions in meeting community credit needs; additional data to include but not be limited to: loans for housing low and moderate-income residents of low and moderate income areas, the scope of efforts to market housing and small business loans in low and moderate-income areas and other data.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. Inez Dickens [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.146 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.207 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.207 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-01-17 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S02461 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO BANKS