NY A01920 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - amended on third reading 1920a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - amended on third reading 1920a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires prior written notice upon hiring to all employees, informing them of the types of electronic monitoring which may occur; provides employers shall also post the notice of electronic monitoring.
Title
Requires prior written notice upon hiring to all employees, informing them of the types of electronic monitoring which may occur; provides employers shall also post the notice of electronic monitoring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 1920a |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.87 |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.104 |
2019-03-05 | Assembly | reported |
2019-02-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-18 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S04586 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - PRINT NUMBER 4586A