NY A01907 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants a $100,000 real property tax exemption to conservation clubs and rod and gun clubs owning land acquired prior to January 1, 2011, having an assessed value of $500,000 or less.
Title
Grants a $100,000 real property tax exemption to conservation clubs and rod and gun clubs owning land acquired prior to January 1, 2011, having an assessed value of $500,000 or less.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2011-05-10 | Assembly | held for consideration in real property taxation |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S00858 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT