NY A01819 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - to attorney-general for opinion
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-18 - to attorney-general for opinion
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a message of necessity shall not be issued for appropriation bills, except in the case of an immediate and extreme fiscal crisis.
Title
Provides that a message of necessity shall not be issued for appropriation bills, except in the case of an immediate and extreme fiscal crisis.
Sponsors
Asm. Hakeem Jeffries [D] | Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D] | Sen. Brian Kavanagh [D] | Asm. Gary Finch [R] |
Asm. Brian Kolb [R] | Asm. Marcus Molinaro [R] | Asm. Teresa Sayward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2011-03-21 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2011-01-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2011-01-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |