NY A01818 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a person is guilty of criminal impersonation in the second degree when a person pretends to be a servicemember or former servicemember, or a first responder, or as having received a decoration or medal; establishes a stolen valor fee.
Title
Provides that a person is guilty of criminal impersonation in the second degree when a person pretends to be a servicemember or former servicemember, or a first responder, or as having received a decoration or medal; establishes a stolen valor fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | print number 1818c |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | print number 1818b |
2024-01-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2023-12-29 | Assembly | print number 1818a |
2023-12-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S09154 (Same As) 2024-05-21 - PRINT NUMBER 9154A