NY A01734 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-2)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes differential payment rates for child care services provided by licensed, registered or enrolled child care providers for providers providing care to children experiencing homelessness, child care providers providing care during nontraditional hours, or in other situations deemed appropriate by a local social services district.
Title
Establishes differential payment rates for child care services provided by licensed, registered or enrolled child care providers for providers providing care to children experiencing homelessness, child care providers providing care during nontraditional hours, or in other situations deemed appropriate by a local social services district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Assembly - Assembly Children And Families Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-20 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
Same As/Similar To
S04079 (Same As) 2024-01-16 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE